calcule

5 x 5=                                                             5254 x 25=                                                                              85654 x 96156=

300 x 500.65=                                                9856 + 85=                                                                             855 x 96 =

85.5 x 5864=                                                  562 x 23=                                                                                965 x 856=

86597 x 56=                                                   256 x 656=                                                                             6666 x 58= 

5236 x =52                                                     9856 x 65=                                                                             965 x 52=

6598 x 57=                                                     986 x 65=                                                                              758 x 856=

 

 

5x8=